Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
10/09/2009 Became Public Law No: 111-70.
10/09/2009 Signed by President.
09/30/2009 Presented to President.
09/29/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2009 Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9941)
09/23/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9827)
04/27/2009 Introduced in House