Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/08/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/08/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/08/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/08/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/08/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/08/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/08/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/08/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/08/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/08/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/08/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/08/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/01/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/01/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/07/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/27/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/27/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/27/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/21/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/21/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/18/2010