Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/30/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/30/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/30/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/30/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/21/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/21/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/24/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/24/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/24/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/24/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/25/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/16/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/16/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/20/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/20/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/20/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/23/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/17/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/30/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/30/2009