Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/05/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/22/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/23/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/24/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/02/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/02/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/23/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/23/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/16/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/22/2010