Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/14/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/14/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/03/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/11/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/11/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/11/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/19/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/19/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/19/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/19/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/25/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/25/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/25/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/25/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/26/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/07/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/07/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/09/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/10/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/14/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/17/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/17/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/17/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/20/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/24/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/24/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/29/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/29/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/29/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/29/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/29/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/30/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/30/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/15/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/15/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/01/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/01/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/01/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/06/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/23/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/29/2010