Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/21/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/19/2009