Committees: H.R.2142 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform04/28/2009 Referred to
05/20/2010 Markup by
06/14/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-504
House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement06/26/2009 Referred to
05/12/2010 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/17/2010 Referred to
09/29/2010 Markup by
12/07/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-372