Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/07/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/09/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/18/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/18/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/18/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/18/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/18/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/18/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/10/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/10/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 12/10/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 12/10/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 12/10/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 12/16/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 02/02/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/14/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/22/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/26/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/04/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/12/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/25/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/08/2010