Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/21/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/25/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/20/2010