Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/30/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/17/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/21/2009