Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/30/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/10/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/07/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/13/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/15/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/15/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/17/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/29/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/30/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/14/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/21/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/29/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/08/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/08/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/21/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/02/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/01/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/01/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/07/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/11/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/12/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/26/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/26/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/03/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/15/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/28/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/29/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/11/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/08/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/16/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/23/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/15/2010