Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/28/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/11/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/11/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/11/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/11/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/11/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/09/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/08/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/16/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/16/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/02/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/17/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/19/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/22/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/21/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/27/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/29/2010