Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/29/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/21/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/19/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/01/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/03/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/12/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/20/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/12/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/26/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/26/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/26/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/26/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/22/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/30/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/30/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/14/2010