Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/22/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/22/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/22/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/22/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/22/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/10/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/13/2009