Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/07/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/07/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/07/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/13/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/20/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/27/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/21/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/30/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/07/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/03/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/03/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 11/04/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/18/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/29/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 02/22/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/02/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/23/2010