Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/29/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/20/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/16/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/14/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/14/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/08/2010