Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 04/29/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/25/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/26/2010