There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to waive housing loan fees for certain veterans with service-connected disabilities called to active service.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/18/2009Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-163.
04/29/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
06/18/2009Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 81.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/18/2009Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-163.
06/10/2009Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
06/10/2009Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/04/2009Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
06/04/2009Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
05/21/2009Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
05/01/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/29/2009Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/29/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/29/2009

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/29/2009 Referred to
06/10/2009 Markup by
06/18/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-163
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity05/01/2009 Referred to
05/21/2009 Hearings by
06/04/2009 Markup by
06/04/2009 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2180.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2180. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (06/18/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Prohibits the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) from collecting a housing loan fee from any veteran who, but for the receipt of active service pay, would be entitled to compensation for a service-connected disability.