Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/08/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/04/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/23/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/22/2010