Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/18/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/18/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/18/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/18/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/18/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/18/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/18/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/18/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/18/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/20/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/20/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/27/2010