Committees: H.R.2194 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/30/2009 Referred to
10/28/2009 Markup by
11/19/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-342
House Financial Services04/30/2009 Referred to
12/04/2009 Discharged from
House Oversight and Government Reform04/30/2009 Referred to
12/04/2009 Discharged from
House Ways and Means04/30/2009 Referred to
12/11/2009 Discharged from
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/16/2009 Referred to
03/11/2010 Discharged from