Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/06/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/06/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/12/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/14/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/19/2010