Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/06/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/12/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/12/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/12/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/12/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/17/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/17/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/17/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/17/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/17/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/18/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/20/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/20/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/26/2010