Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/03/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/03/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/14/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/12/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/17/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/17/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/17/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/17/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/14/2010