Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/30/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/20/2009