Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/14/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/14/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/15/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/20/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/08/2009