Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/21/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/21/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/23/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/23/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/23/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/23/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/15/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/14/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/27/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/25/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/22/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/22/2010