Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/30/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/06/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/06/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/06/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/25/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/07/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/16/2009