Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/14/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/23/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/23/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/10/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/22/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/10/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 02/22/2010