Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/14/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/14/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/14/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/14/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/14/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/21/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/21/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/21/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/21/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/21/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/21/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/21/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/21/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/21/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/28/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/28/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/28/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/28/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/28/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/28/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/28/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/28/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/28/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/28/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/28/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/28/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/28/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/28/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/02/2009
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2010