Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/05/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/12/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/02/2009