Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/05/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/12/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/12/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/12/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/12/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/13/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/19/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/19/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/19/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/23/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/07/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/08/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/08/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/03/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/02/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/26/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/26/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/30/2010