Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/10/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/17/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/31/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/29/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/22/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 11/17/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/02/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/25/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/14/2010