Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/08/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 01/08/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/08/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/08/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/08/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/09/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/09/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/09/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/09/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/21/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/21/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/21/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/21/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/21/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/13/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/13/2009