Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/11/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/11/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/11/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/20/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/04/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/04/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/04/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/04/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/04/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/15/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/15/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/15/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/15/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/15/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/26/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/08/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/08/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/14/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/14/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/22/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/29/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/05/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/15/2010