Text: H.R.2254 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/05/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 2254

To amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify presumptions relating to the exposure of certain veterans who served in the vicinity of the Republic of Vietnam.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
May 5, 2009

Mr. Filner (for himself, Ms. Corrine Brown of Florida, Mr. Kagen, Mr. Latham, Mr. Roe of Tennessee, Ms. Bordallo, Mr. Hall of New York, Mr. Kennedy, Mr. Reyes, Mr. Pastor of Arizona, Mr. Ortiz, Ms. Loretta Sanchez of California, Mr. Michaud, Mr. Tim Murphy of Pennsylvania, and Mr. Platts) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Veterans’ Affairs


A BILL

To amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify presumptions relating to the exposure of certain veterans who served in the vicinity of the Republic of Vietnam.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Agent Orange Equity Act of 2009”.

SEC. 2. Clarification of presumptions of exposure for veterans who served in the vicinity of the Republic of Vietnam.

(a) Clarification.—Section 1116 of title 38, United States Code, is amended—

(1) in subsections (a)(1) and (f), by striking “a veteran who, during active military, naval, or air service, served in the Republic of Vietnam during the period beginning on January 9, 1962, and ending on May 7, 1975” and inserting “a veteran described in subsection (g)”; and

(2) by adding at the end the following new subsection:

“(g) A veteran described in this subsection is a veteran who—

“(1) during active military, naval, or air service—

“(A) served in the Republic of Vietnam (including the inland waterways, ports, and harbors of such Republic, the waters offshore of such Republic, and the airspace above such Republic) during the period beginning on January 9, 1962, and ending on May 7, 1975; or

“(B) served in Johnston Island during the period beginning on April 1, 1972, and ending on September 30, 1977; or

“(2) received the Vietnam Service Medal or the Vietnam Campaign Medal.”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendments made by subsection (a) shall take effect as of September 25, 1985.