Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/15/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/15/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/15/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/15/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/09/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/09/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/23/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/20/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/12/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/12/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 01/19/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/27/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/09/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 03/09/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/09/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/30/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/30/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/30/2010