Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/13/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/13/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/31/2009