Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/05/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 05/05/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/14/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/14/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/14/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/12/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/24/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/08/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/08/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/14/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/14/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/14/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/23/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/30/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/30/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/30/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/14/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/21/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/21/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/21/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/21/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/06/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/08/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/18/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/25/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/13/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/27/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/27/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/05/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/05/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/25/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/17/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/24/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/22/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 08/10/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/23/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/16/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/16/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/09/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/16/2010