Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/06/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 05/06/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/07/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/21/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/04/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/19/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/19/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/23/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/26/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/26/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/26/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/17/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/28/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/17/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/15/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/16/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/26/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/13/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/28/2010