Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 01/13/2010