There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Sanctity of Human Life Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that human life shall be deemed to begin with fertilization.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/07/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/07/2009Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/2009Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H66)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/09/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/09/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/21/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/21/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/26/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/21/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/30/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/07/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.227.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.227. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/07/2009)

Sanctity of Human Life Act - Declares that: (1) the right to life guaranteed by the Constitution is vested in each human and is the person's paramount and most fundamental right; (2) each human life begins with fertilization, cloning, or its functional equivalent, at which time every human has all legal and constitutional attributes and privileges of personhood; and (3) Congress, each state, the District of Columbia, and all U.S. territories have the authority to protect all human lives.