Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/25/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/08/2009