Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/04/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/16/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/16/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/16/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/25/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/22/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/22/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/22/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/22/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/25/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/25/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/25/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/25/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/25/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 10/15/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/15/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/15/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/15/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/15/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/23/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/23/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/23/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/16/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/16/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/12/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/12/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/12/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/12/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/25/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/15/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/15/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/06/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/06/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/19/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/10/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/24/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/24/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/24/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/15/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/15/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/30/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/30/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/02/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 12/02/2010