Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/06/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/31/2009