Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/06/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/24/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/30/2010