Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/07/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/03/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/18/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/30/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/23/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/23/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/14/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/20/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/20/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/26/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/26/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/24/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/26/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 08/10/2010