Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/27/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/16/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/16/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/22/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/15/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/30/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/16/2010