Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/07/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 08/10/2010