Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/11/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/26/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/10/2009